This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 22:14:54 (UTC).

Benito Nunez vs. Arthur Boyadzhyan

Case Summary

On 11/28/2016 Benito Nunez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arthur Boyadzhyan. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nunez, Ascencion

Nunez, Lizbeth

Nunez, Benito

Nunez, Selestino

Nunez, Yazmin

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Boyadzhyan, Arthur

Olivares, Maria Luisa

Olivares, Claudio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peterson, Kirt J

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Ducey, Mitchell F

Carpenter, Gregory J

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2017
  • Demurrer (CLM) - to Plaintiff's Complaint scheduled for 03/30/2017 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 02/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Demurrer (to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of Ps & As in Support Thereof; Declaration of Arthur Boyadzhyan; Proposed Order) filed by Boyadzhyan, Arthur on 02/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Nunez, Lizbeth; Nunez, Selestino; Nunez, Yazmin on 01/24/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Summons issued on 12/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Benito Nunez) filed by Nunez, Lizbeth on 12/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nunez, Benito; Nunez, Ascencion; Nunez, Yazmin; Nunez, Selestino; Nunez, Lizbeth on 11/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Complaint filed by Nunez, Benito; Nunez, Ascencion; Nunez, Yazmin; Nunez, Selestino; Nunez, Lizbeth on 11/28/2016. Filed By: Nunez, Benito(Plaintiff) | Nunez, Ascencion(Plaintiff) | Nunez, Yazmin(Plaintiff) | Nunez, Selestino(Plaintiff) | Nunez, Lizbeth(Plaintiff) | Nunez, Benito(Plaintiff) Refers To: Boyadzhyan, Arthur(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less