This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 11:59:35 (UTC).

Bejarano vs Hyundai Rotem USA

Case Summary

On 02/17/2016 Bejarano filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hyundai Rotem USA. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lara, Isaac Rolon

Bejarano, Olivia Murillo

Defendants

Harvest Management LLC

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Southern California Regional Rail Authority

County of Ventura

Ventura County Transportation Commission

City of Oxnard

State of California

Hyundai Rotem USA Corporation

Hyundai Rotem Company

The Growers Company Inc

Sanchez Ramirez, Jose Alejandro

The People of the State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation

State of California and its Public Utilities Commission

County of Ventura and its Transportation Commission

State of California and its Department of Transportation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Makkabi, David F

Defendant Attorneys

Bergsten, Robert T

Murphy, Michael E

DEGEN, ALYCIA A.

Hoppe, Theodore W

CAPELLA, RICHARD A.

WEISEL, ERIC D

Lee, Brian J

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:44 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 2:44 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: RE: STAY (NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF JOINT STATUS REPORT FILED ON OR BEFORE 6/21/17); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: RE: STAY (NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF JOINT STATUS REPORT FILED ON OR BEFORE 11/10/16; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: RE: STAY (NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY IF JOINT STATUS REPORT FILED PRIOR); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: Complex Case Designation; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 02/26/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDesignated as an exceptional action on 02/26/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 42 effective 02/23/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketStatus Conference - Complex Case Designation scheduled for 05/16/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 02/23/2016 02:44:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (56-2015-00465017, 56-2015-00465020, 56-2015-00467008; 56-2015-00467774) filed by Bejarano, Olivia Murillo; Lara, Isaac Rolon on 02/17/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/13/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bejarano, Olivia Murillo; Lara, Isaac Rolon on 02/17/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bejarano, Olivia Murillo; Lara, Isaac Rolon on 02/17/2016. Filed By: Bejarano, Olivia Murillo(Plaintiff) | Lara, Isaac Rolon(Plaintiff) Refers To: County of Ventura(Defendant) | City of Oxnard(Defendant) | Union Pacific Railroad Company(Defendant) | State of California(Defendant) | Southern California Regional Rail Authority(Defendant) | Ventura County Transportation Commission(Defendant) | Harvest Management LLC(Defendant) | The Growers Company Inc(Defendant) | Sanchez Ramirez, Jose(Defendant) | Hyundai Rotem USA Corporation(Defendant) | Hyundai Rotem Company(Defendant) | The People of the State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less