This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 21:51:53 (UTC).

Barry M Cogen vs. Michael Fain Conner

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Barry M Cogen filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Fain Conner. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cogen, Wendy W

Cogen, Barry M

Defendants

Hudson Insurance Company

Lazcanos Mansonry & Concrete Inc

Conner, Michael Fain

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVINE, JAMES B.

Defendant Attorneys

Cameron, Clark H

Kim, Amber N

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion To Compel Further Response To Interrogatories; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMotion To Compel Further Response To Interrogatories - scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatory No. 36 Off Calendar) filed by Conner, Michael Fain on 10/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMotion To Compel Further Response To Interrogatories - scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 10/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement (of Interrogatories in Dispute) filed by Conner, Michael Fain on 10/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Further Answers to Interrogatory No. 36; Declaration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Exhibits) filed by Conner, Michael Fain on 10/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Lazcanos Masonry & Concrete Inc on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W on 06/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Conner, Michael Fain on 05/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Conner, Michael Fain on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W on 04/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W on 03/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Joaquin Reyes, authorized to accept) filed by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W on 03/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent of Service Carlos Paz, CT Corp.) filed by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W on 03/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Juan Lazcano, Authorized agent) filed by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W on 03/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W rejected on 03/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W on 02/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cogen, Barry M; Cogen, Wendy W on 02/10/2021. Filed By: Cogen, Wendy W(Plaintiff) | Cogen, Barry M(Plaintiff) Refers To: American Contractors Indemnity Company(Defendant) | Lazcanos Mansonry & Concrete Inc(Defendant) | Hudson Insurance Company(Defendant) | Conner, Michael(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVINE JAMES B.