This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 17:59:57 (UTC).

Barrios vs Providence Hospitality Partners LLC

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 Barrios filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Providence Hospitality Partners LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barrios, Vincent

Moraga, Miranda

Defendants

Providence Hospitality Partners LLC

Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tojarieh, Joseph

Defendant Attorney

Everson, Danielle R

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 9:07 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:21 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:21 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 9:07 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Conference; Description: re: Complex Case Designaton; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2016
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 09/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Demurrer (to Plaintiffs Complaint. Memo of Ps&As) filed by Providence Hospitality Partners LLC; Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC on 09/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 08/25/2016 09:07:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Case reassigned to Department 41 effective 08/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Declaration of Prejudice CCP 170.6 (Judge Borrell (forwarded to Kellegrew for ruling)) filed by Barrios, Vincent; Moraga, Miranda on 08/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Barrios, Vincent; Moraga, Miranda on 07/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/23/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barrios, Vincent; Moraga, Miranda on 07/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Complaint filed by Barrios, Vincent; Moraga, Miranda on 07/28/2016. Filed By: Barrios, Vincent(Plaintiff) | Moraga, Miranda(Plaintiff) Refers To: Providence Hospitality Partners LLC(Defendant) | Ventura Hospitality Partners LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Providence Hospitality Partners LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOJARIEH JOSEPH