This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 21:06:17 (UTC).

Barrett vs El Rancho Simi Pioneer Cemetery District

Case Summary

On 10/25/2016 Barrett filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against El Rancho Simi Pioneer Cemetery District. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barrett, Jarod

Barrett, Georffrey

Barrett, Geoffrey

Defendants

Scroggins, Barbara

El Rancho Simi Pioneer Cemetery District

El Rancho Simi Cemetery District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yorke, Brian

Defendant Attorneys

Beck, Susan Knock

BOSWELL, LISA L.

Tabura, Richard R.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2017
  • Case Management Statement filed by El Rancho Simi Pioneer Cemetery District on 03/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • BOSWELL, LISA L. added as a effective 03/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Complaint - Amended (First) filed by Barrett, Geoffrey; Barrett, Jarod on 03/02/2017. Filed By: Barrett, Geoffrey(Plaintiff) | Barrett, Jarod(Plaintiff) Refers To: El Rancho Simi Pioneer Cemetery District(Defendant) | Scroggins, Barbara(Defendant) | El Rancho Simi Cemetery District(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension filed by El Rancho Simi Pioneer Cemetery District on 02/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Summons issued on 11/04/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Geoffrey Barrett) filed by Barrett, Jarod on 11/04/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/24/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barrett, Georffrey; Barrett, Jarod on 10/25/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Complaint filed by Barrett, Georffrey; Barrett, Jarod on 10/25/2016. Filed By: Barrett, Geoffrey(Plaintiff) | Barrett, Jarod(Plaintiff) Refers To: El Rancho Simi Pioneer Cemetery District(Defendant) | Scroggins, Barbara(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less