This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/18/2021 at 07:00:56 (UTC).

Barbara Lecouris vs. Bari Slovis

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Barbara Lecouris filed an Other lawsuit against Bari Slovis. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lecouris, Barbara

Respondent

Slovis, Bari

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Rista, Anthony J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders has been Denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketHearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 07/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketHearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 07/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Lecouris, Barbara on 06/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketResponse to Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Slovis, Bari on 06/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (EA-100 Request for Elder Abuse Restraining Order; EA-109 Notice of Court Hearing; EA-110 TRO; etc) filed by Lecouris, Barbara on 05/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/22/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Lecouris, Barbara on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Lecouris, Barbara on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Lecouris, Barbara on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Lecouris, Barbara on 05/20/2021. Filed By: Lecouris, Barbara(Petitioner) Refers To: Slovis, Bari(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rista, Anthony J.