This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 14:33:01 (UTC).

Bahareh Ramezani vs Amgen Inc

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Bahareh Ramezani filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Amgen Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Ramezani, Bahareh

Amgen Inc

Ortega, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

NOSRATI, OMID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ramezani, Bahareh on 04/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Stipulation and Order (for Final and Binding Arbitration and to Stay Proceeding) filed by Amgen Inc; Ortega, Paul on 06/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Answer submitted by Amgen Inc; Ortega, Paul rejected on 06/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Stipulation and Order (for Final and Binding Arbitration and to Stay Proceeding and routed to ct 21) received from Amgen Inc; Ortega, Paul on 06/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Summons issued on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Amgen Inc on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Complaint (for Monetary and Punitive Damages) filed by Amgen Inc on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Ramezani, Bahareh(Plaintiff) Refers To: Amgen Inc(Defendant) | Ortega, Paul(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amgen Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nosrati, Omid