This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/08/2021 at 20:38:16 (UTC).

AT&T vs. County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 AT T filed an Other lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pacific Bell Telephone Company

AT&T Corp

AT&T Mobility LLC

Defendants

The State Board of Equalization

County of Ventura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boersch, Martha A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by AT&T Corp; AT&T Mobility LLC; Pacific Bell Telephone Company on 12/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by AT&T Mobility LLC; Pacific Bell Telephone Company; AT&T Corp on 10/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by AT&T Mobility LLC; Pacific Bell Telephone Company; AT&T Corp on 10/22/2020. Filed By: AT&T Mobility LLC(Plaintiff) | AT&T Corp(Plaintiff) | Pacific Bell Telephone Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: The State Board of Equalization(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant