This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 02:00:08 (UTC).

Asha Portugal vs. Steven Stroh

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Asha Portugal filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Steven Stroh. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portugal, Asha

Defendant

Stroh, Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hankey, Jordan D

Defendant Attorney

Hamilton, Kenneth N.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Portugal, Asha on 12/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Responses to Form Interrogatories; Imposition of Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; De...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Responses to Special Interrogatories, Imposition of Sanctions; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Responses to Requests for Production for Documents, Imposition of Sanctions; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 12/08/2022 08:20:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Responses to Form Interrogatories; Imposition of Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Christian Bosuel. Exhibits. [Proposed] Order scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel - For Order Establishing Admissions and Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Christian Bosuel, Exhibits scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 06/30/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMotion - Other (For Order Establishing Admissions and Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Christian Bosuel, Exhibits) filed by Portugal, Asha on 06/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Stroh, Steven on 12/17/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default submitted by Portugal, Asha rejected on 12/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (served on Kenneth N. Hamilton, Atty for Def Steven Stroh) filed by Portugal, Asha on 12/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt submitted by Portugal, Asha rejected on 12/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portugal, Asha on 08/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Portugal, Asha on 08/04/2021. Filed By: Portugal, Asha(Plaintiff) Refers To: Stroh, Steven(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hamilton, Kenneth N.