Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 01:29:08 (UTC).

Arnold Ngo vs. Siemens Industry Inc

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Arnold Ngo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Siemens Industry Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ngo, Sarah

Ngo, Arnold

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Siemens Industry Inc

County of Ventura

City of Simi Valley

Singh, Gurmett

Singh, Gurmeet

Defendants and Cross Defendants

County of Ventura

Singh, Gurmett

Singh, Gurmeet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bunch, Bruce M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SIPPRELLE, KEITH A.

McMurdo, Brett B

Carobini, Daniel J

MORGENSTERN, ROBERT A

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

McMurdo, Brett B

MORGENSTERN, ROBERT A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMotion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - scheduled for 03/25/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (to Take Off Calendar His Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement [CCP 877.6(a)(1)) filed by Singh, Gurmeet on 03/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Joinder to Opposition of Siemens Industry Inc to Gurmeet Singhs Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed by City of Simi Valley on 03/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Kieth A. Sipprelle in Support of Opposition of Siemens Industry Inc to Motion of Gurmeet Singh for Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed by Siemens Industry Inc on 03/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Motion of Gurmeet Singh for Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed by Siemens Industry Inc on 03/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Ngo, Arnold; Ngo, Sarah on 03/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Siemens Industry Inc on 03/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMotion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - scheduled for 03/25/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 02/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketMcMurdo, Brett B added as a effective 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Siemens Industry Inc on 08/03/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Manjeet Raur , Wife/Co Occupant on 07-03-20) filed by Ngo, Arnold; Ngo, Sarah on 07/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Tamara Cusano - Recording Clerk at City Clerk's Office on 07-07-20) filed by Ngo, Arnold; Ngo, Sarah on 07/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Monica Sanchez, Office Assistant/Person Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Ngo, Arnold; Ngo, Sarah on 07/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Daisy Montenegro, Process Intake Clerk/Registered Agent, CT Corporation Systems Inc) filed by Ngo, Arnold; Ngo, Sarah on 07/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/30/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ngo, Arnold; Ngo, Sarah on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ngo, Arnold; Ngo, Sarah on 06/10/2020. Filed By: Ngo, Sarah(Plaintiff) | Ngo, Arnold(Plaintiff) Refers To: Siemens Industry Inc(Defendant) | City of Simi Valley(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant) | Singh, Gurmett(Defendant) | Singh, Gurmeet(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siemens Industry Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUNCH, BRUCE M