Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:22 (UTC).

Arcturus Properties vs Baker

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Arcturus Properties filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arcturus Properties General Partnership

Defendant

Baker, Noel Edgar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITEHEAD, FRANK H III

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: setting aside default, vacating default judgment and staying executin of judgment; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2017
  • Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Judgment for Arcturus Properties General Partnership against Baker, Noel Edgar in the amount of: 1906.08 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 325.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 05/04/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 05/04/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Declaration and Order that Copy be Accepted in Lieu of Original Document filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 05/04/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Declaration and Worksheet for Default Judgment-Unlawful Detainer filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 04/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 04/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • Writ of Possession Returned (satisfied) filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 12/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Judgment for Arcturus Properties General Partnership against Baker, Noel Edgar in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 08/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants (served on Noel Baker with prej claim and by mailing) filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 08/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 08/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Default entered as to Baker, Noel Edgar on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 08/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (and prej claim) filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 08/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 48.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Arcturus Properties General Partnership on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Arcturus Properties General Partnership(Plaintiff) Refers To: Baker, Noel(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less