This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 15:48:16 (UTC).

Archdiocese of Los Angeles Insurance Company vs. Diego Jimenez

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Archdiocese of Los Angeles Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Diego Jimenez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Archdiocese of Los Angeles Insurance Company

Defendants

Sanchez, Francisca

Jimenez, Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES, TODD F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Patricia Mesa Co Occupant on 07-09-20) filed by Archdiocese of Los Angeles Insurance Company on 07/15/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Patricia Mesa Co Occupant on 07-09-20) filed by Archdiocese of Los Angeles Insurance Company on 07/15/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Archdiocese of Los Angeles Insurance Company on 06/10/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Archdiocese of Los Angeles Insurance Company on 06/10/2020. Filed By: Archdiocese of Los Angeles Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sanchez, Francisca(Defendant) | Jimenez, Diego(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES THE is a litigant