This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 18:31:45 (UTC).

Anthony Winser vs. Pardee Homes

Case Summary

On 05/19/2011 Anthony Winser filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pardee Homes. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondent / Appellees and Appellants

Winser, Anthony

Winser, Michelle

Pardee Homes

Defendants, Respondent / Appellees and Appellants

Pardee Construction Company

Pardee Homes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

ADELMAN, FRED M

Plaintiff, Appellant and Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

ADELMAN, FRED M

Makarczyk, Mayo L.

Titus, Robert B

Carelli, Paul V

Appellant, Defendant and Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Titus, Robert B

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 1:34 PM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:24 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:09 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for New Trial; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 1:34 PM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:24 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:09 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion for New Trial; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time: 8:21 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
811 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketAnswer filed by Pardee Homes on 08/23/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DocketOSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - File Proof of Service on Complaint of Winser as to All Named Defendants scheduled for 09/14/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Shirley Joyner authorized agent) filed by Winser, Anthony; Winser, Michelle on 08/05/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Shirley Joyner authorized agent) filed by Winser, Anthony; Winser, Michelle on 08/05/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketOSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - File Proof of Service on Complaint of Winser as to All Named Defendants scheduled for 09/14/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 06/01/2011 01:16:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketDeclaration for Court Assignment filed by Winser, Anthony; Winser, Michelle on 05/19/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Winser, Anthony; Winser, Michelle on 05/19/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed by Winser, Anthony; Winser, Michelle on 05/19/2011. Filed By: Winser, Anthony(Plaintiff) | Winser, Michelle(Plaintiff) Refers To: Pardee Homes(Defendant) | Pardee Construction Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARDEE HOMES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TITUS ROBERT B.