This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/20/2023 at 14:00:34 (UTC).

Annette Watterson vs. Wei Cong

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 Annette Watterson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wei Cong. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Watterson, Annette

Watterson, David

Watterson, Maghrae

Defendants

Caltrans

Cong, Wei

The City of Camarillo

The County of Ventura

The Department of Transportation for The City of Camarillo

The State of California

The State of California Department of Transportation

The Ventura County Metropolitan Transportation Authority

County of Ventura

The People of the State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation

Ventura County Transporation Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beecher, Brian

Defendant Attorneys

Cohen, Jason S

Renshaw, Christine

Solares, Erick L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Cong, Wei on 02/07/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer filed by Cong, Wei on 02/07/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Yin Doe, Co-Occupant) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 01/17/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (County of Ventura erroneously sued as The County of Ventura ONLY for a mutual waiver of costs) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOpposition (to County of Ventura's Demurrer to Complaint; Declaration of Brandon J Carr) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOpposition (to Ventura County Transporation Commission's Demurrer to Complaint; Declaration of Brandon J. Carr) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 01/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Defendant Ventura County Transporation Commission) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 01/03/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party submitted by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae rejected on 12/19/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,015 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less