This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 09:01:51 (UTC).

Annette Watterson vs. Wei Cong

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 Annette Watterson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wei Cong. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Watterson, Annette

Watterson, David

Watterson, Maghrae

Defendants

Caltrans

Cong, Wei

The City of Camarillo

The County of Ventura

The Department of Transportation for The City of Camarillo

The State of California

The State of California Department of Transportation

The Ventura County Metropolitan Transportation Authority

County of Ventura

The People of the State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation

Ventura County Transporation Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beecher, Brian

Defendant Attorneys

Cohen, Jason S

Renshaw, Christine

Solares, Erick L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Cong, Wei on 02/07/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer filed by Cong, Wei on 02/07/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Description: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Yin Doe, Co-Occupant) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 01/17/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (County of Ventura erroneously sued as The County of Ventura ONLY for a mutual waiver of costs) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOpposition (to County of Ventura's Demurrer to Complaint; Declaration of Brandon J Carr) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served John E Maldonado (Refused First Name) Sheriff Agent in Charge Authorized to Accept) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 10/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Armin Doe, Clerk authorized to accept) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 10/25/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving John E Maldonado, Sheriff, Agent) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 10/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Silvia Juarez, City Clerk, Authorized) filed by Watterson, Maghrae; Watterson, David; Watterson, Annette on 10/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Watterson, Maghrae; Watterson, David; Watterson, Annette on 10/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Julie Taylor, Clerk of the Board, Authorized) filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 10/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 10/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Watterson, Annette; Watterson, David; Watterson, Maghrae on 10/04/2022. Filed By: Watterson, David(Plaintiff) | Watterson, Maghrae(Plaintiff) | Watterson, Annette(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cong, Wei(Defendant) | Caltrans(Defendant) | The Department of Transportation for The City of Camarillo(Defendant) | The County of Ventura(Defendant) | The Ventura County Metropolitan Transportation Authority(Defendant) | The State of California(Defendant) | The State of California Department of Transportation(Defendant) | The City of Camarillo(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant) | The People of the State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation(Defendant) | Ventura County Transporation Commission(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less