This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 07:30:07 (UTC).

Anita Ogletree vs. GJKN Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Anita Ogletree filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GJKN Corporation. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ogletree, Anita

Defendant

GJKN Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL, SCOTT J.

Defendant Attorney

Knauss, Joanne Mirras

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: Ex Parte App to Dismiss Action for Failure to File Amended Complaint; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/23/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Victoria C Knowles in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Dismiss) filed by Ogletree, Anita on 06/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Dismiss) filed by Ogletree, Anita on 06/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Ex Parte App to Dismiss Action for Failure to File Amended Complaint scheduled for 06/23/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (to Dismiss Action for Failure to Timely File Amended Complaint; Declaration Re Notice) filed by GJKN Corporation on 06/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Ogletree, Anita on 06/20/2022. Filed By: Ogletree, Anita(Plaintiff) Refers To: GJKN Corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE Defendant's Demurrer to Complaint) filed by GJKN Corporation on 06/06/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Scott J. Ferrell in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint) filed by Ogletree, Anita on 05/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketObjection (Evidentiary Objections to 1) Declaration of Joanne Mirras Knaus; 2) Defendants Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer; and 3) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer) filed by Ogletree, Anita on 05/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 05/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - to Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration Re Meet and Confer scheduled for 06/02/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (Filed in Support of Demurrer) filed by GJKN Corporation on 05/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (to Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration Re Meet and Confer) filed by GJKN Corporation on 05/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Spiro Kokkinos, Agent for Service of Process; Sub-served Ryan Doe, Shift Leader/Authorized to Accept) filed by Ogletree, Anita on 03/23/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ogletree, Anita on 03/09/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ogletree, Anita on 03/09/2022. Filed By: Ogletree, Anita(Plaintiff) Refers To: GJKN Corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J