This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 10/19/2019 at 21:17:38 (UTC).

Anderson vs Anderson

Case Summary

On 06/30/2014 Anderson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anderson Singer, Ronda

Anderson, Lorenn

Defendants

Adela Rosario Sotomayor Anderson Individually and as Trustee

Anderson, Daniella L

Barbara J Anderson Individually and as Trustee

Charles E Anderson Individually and as Trustee

James Robert Safechuck Individually and as Trustee

Stephanie Lee Safechuck Individually and as Trustee

Anderson, Adela Sotomayor

Safechuck, Stephanie

Barbara J Anderson individually and as Trustee of the Sanette Trust

Anderson, Susan Elizybeth

Safechuck, James Robert

Charles E Anderson individually and as Trustee of the Sanette Trust

Safechuck, Stephanie Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIRSCHMAN, ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

Marx, Darin

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Joinder; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 10:46 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Chris Daugherty, husband) filed by Anderson, Lorenn on 08/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (summons and complaint) filed by Anderson, Lorenn on 08/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (summons and complaint) filed by Anderson, Lorenn on 08/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (summons and complaint) filed by Anderson, Lorenn on 08/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (summons and complaint) filed by Anderson, Lorenn on 08/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (summons and complaint) submitted by Anderson, Lorenn rejected on 08/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/21/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Lorenn; Anderson Singer, Ronda on 06/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Complaint (Elder Abuse) filed by Anderson, Lorenn; Anderson Singer, Ronda on 06/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARX DARIN C