This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 22:25:47 (UTC).

Anacleto Ramirez vs. Warren Avard Inc

Case Summary

On 01/12/2015 Anacleto Ramirez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Warren Avard Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alarcon, Raul

Ramirez, Anacleto

Defendant

Warren Avard Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yarian, Levik

Defendant Attorney

CHAFFIN, KEVIN D.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 6 day jury trial; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Description: for Defendant's Failure to Appear at Mandatory CMC; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2015
  • Case Management Statement filed by Alarcon, Raul; Ramirez, Anacleto on 05/26/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney submitted by Warren Avard Inc rejected on 05/21/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Answer filed by Warren Avard Inc on 03/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • CHAFFIN, KEVIN D. added as a effective 03/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Ramirez, Anacleto rejected on 02/27/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Sam Avard Agent) filed by Ramirez, Anacleto; Alarcon, Raul on 02/23/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/10/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez, Anacleto; Alarcon, Raul on 01/12/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Complaint filed by Ramirez, Anacleto; Alarcon, Raul on 01/12/2015. Filed By: Ramirez, Anacleto(Plaintiff) | Alarcon, Raul(Plaintiff) Refers To: Warren Avard Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less