This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 20:18:44 (UTC).

AmeriCredit Financial vs. Hurtado

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 AmeriCredit Financial filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hurtado. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Americredit Financial Services Inc

Defendant

Hurtado, Jose J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERNEST, STEVEN E

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Application (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Application (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: /OSC Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2016
  • Application (CLM) - for Writ of Possession scheduled for 12/13/2016 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Application for Writ of Possession) filed by Americredit Financial Services Inc on 10/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Declaration - Other (of Steven E. Ernest re: Venue Pursuant to CCC 2984.4) filed by Americredit Financial Services Inc on 10/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Application for Writ of Possession filed by Americredit Financial Services Inc on 10/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Declaration - Other (of Brandy Rice in Support of Application for Writ of Possession) filed by Americredit Financial Services Inc on 10/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (with hearing date of 12/13/2016) filed by Americredit Financial Services Inc on 10/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/27/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Americredit Financial Services Inc on 10/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Complaint (for Possession of Personal Property; Breach of Contract and Damages; Common Counts) filed by Americredit Financial Services Inc on 10/03/2016. Filed By: Americredit Financial Services Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hurtado, Jose(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less