This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 10/14/2021 at 00:11:28 (UTC).

American Recovery vs. Amos & Muffoletto

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 American Recovery filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Amos Muffoletto. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Recovery Service Incorporated

Defendants

Amos & Muffoletto LLC

Law Offices of Mark J Muffoletto LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, TIMOTHY P.

Defendant Attorney

Waxler, Andrew J.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Status Hearing; Description: re stay pending Maryland action.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketStatus Hearing - re stay pending Maryland action. scheduled for 03/10/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Amend (CLM); Description: to File Second Amended Complaint; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (Second) filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated on 10/04/2021. Filed By: American Recovery Service Incorporated(Plaintiff) Refers To: Law Offices of Mark J Muffoletto LLC(Defendant) | Amos & Muffoletto LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting (Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint) filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated; Amos & Muffoletto LLC on 09/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Amend (CLM) - to File Second Amended Complaint scheduled for 10/05/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Other (for order Granting Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint) filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated; Amos & Muffoletto LLC on 09/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Amos & Muffoletto LLC; Law Offices of Mark J Muffoletto LLC on 09/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Description: to Stay Proceedings; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (to File Second Amended Complaint; Memo of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion) filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 08/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 08/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (CLM) - to Stay Proceedings scheduled for 09/09/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings) filed by Amos & Muffoletto LLC; Law Offices of Mark J Muffoletto LLC on 08/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (to Stay Proceedings, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof) filed by Amos & Muffoletto LLC; Law Offices of Mark J Muffoletto LLC on 08/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated on 05/19/2021. Filed By: American Recovery Service Incorporated(Plaintiff) Refers To: Law Offices of Mark J Muffoletto LLC(Defendant) | Amos & Muffoletto LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated on 04/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated on 04/05/2021. Filed By: American Recovery Service Incorporated(Plaintiff) Refers To: Amos & Muffoletto LLC(Defendant) | Law Offices of Mark J Muffoletto LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAXLER ANDREW J.