This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 02:50:01 (UTC).

ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC vs. Diebold Incorporated

Case Summary

On 08/13/2013 ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Diebold Incorporated. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC

Defendant

Diebold Incorporated

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketMail Returned Undeliverable (Notice of Entry of judgment) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 10/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketJudgment for ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC against Diebold Incorporated in the amount of: 650.00 principal, punitive damages, 40.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 09/23/2013. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 09/23/2013 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • DocketThe Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC and AGAINST Diebold Incorporated in the amount of $650.00 principal, $40.00 costs. Judgment Details: None. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (Signed by agent Rudy Rivera, on 08/17/13; costs 15.00) filed by ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC on 08/30/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Docketcertified mail plaintifs claim sent to Diebold Incorporated Agent for Service CT Corp. Systems 878 W. 7th Los Angeles CA 90017 on 08.13.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketCertified Mail Receipt filed by ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC on 08/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - scheduled for 09/23/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC on 08/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC on 08/13/2013. Filed By: ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Diebold Incorporated(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE MAINTENANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DIEBOLD NIXDORF INCORPORATED is a litigant