This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 14:33:07 (UTC).

Alliance United Parking vs. Mastros Restaurants LLC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Alliance United Parking filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mastros Restaurants LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alliance United Parking Systems LLC ABC Valet

Defendants

Mastros Restuarants LLC

Mastros Restaurants LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HORWITZ, ALAN M.

Defendant Attorney

Hunter, Andrew R.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:05 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:05 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 2:05 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2016
  • Demurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 08/05/2016 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Complaint - Amended (First Amended Complaint) filed by Alliance United Parking Systems LLC ABC Valet on 07/19/2016. Filed By: Alliance United Parking Systems LLC ABC Valet(Plaintiff) Refers To: Mastros Restaurants LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 06/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Demurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 08/05/2016 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Demurrer filed by Mastros Restaurants LLC on 06/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served on Vivian Imperial Senior Intake Specialist) filed by Alliance United Parking Systems LLC ABC Valet on 06/02/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/23/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alliance United Parking Systems LLC ABC Valet on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Complaint filed by Alliance United Parking Systems LLC ABC Valet on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Alliance United Parking Systems LLC ABC Valet(Plaintiff) Refers To: Mastros Restaurants LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTMES is a litigant

Latest cases where MASTRO'S RESTAURANTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNTER ANDREW R