This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 21:11:16 (UTC).

Alliance United Insurance vs Vizarra

Case Summary

On 10/27/2016 Alliance United Insurance filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Vizarra. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alliance United Insurance Company

Defendant

Vizarra, Eugenio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES, TODD F

Defendant Attorney

COLMAN, JONATHAN H

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: /OSC Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/02/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 03/27/2017 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (Incorrect Name (Eugenio Vizarra, true name Eugenio Vizarra aka Eugenio A Corral) filed by Alliance United Insurance Company on 03/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (Incorrect Name (Eugenio Vizarra, true name Eugenio Vizarra aka Eugenio A Corral) fwd to C40 for signature) received from Alliance United Insurance Company on 03/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Case Management Statement filed by Alliance United Insurance Company on 02/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/27/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alliance United Insurance Company on 10/27/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Complaint filed by Alliance United Insurance Company on 10/27/2016. Filed By: Alliance United Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Vizarra, Eugenio(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less