This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 04:10:05 (UTC).

Alicia Ordaz vs. Adam Gonzales Zepeda

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Alicia Ordaz filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Adam Gonzales Zepeda. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ordaz, Xena

Ordaz, Alicia

Defendants

Petersen-Dean Inc

Gonzales Zepeda, Adam Jr

Zepeda, Adam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Coons, Michael H

Reynoso, Fernando

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Zepeda, Adam; Petersen-Dean Inc on 03/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketZepeda, Adam added as a Defendant effective 03/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney (New Counsel Michael Coons) filed by Ordaz, Alicia; Ordaz, Xena on 01/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued on 10/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Alicia Ordaz) filed by Ordaz, Xena on 10/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ordaz, Alicia; Ordaz, Xena on 10/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ordaz, Alicia; Ordaz, Xena on 10/09/2020. Filed By: Ordaz, Xena(Plaintiff) | Ordaz, Alicia(Plaintiff) Refers To: Gonzales Zepeda, Adam(Defendant) | Petersen-Dean Inc(Defendant) | Zepeda, Adam(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETERSEN-DEAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOSO, FERNANDO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COONS MICHAEL HOWARD