This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 14:32:58 (UTC).

Alan Arthur Zarzar vs. Teri Hike

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Alan Arthur Zarzar filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Teri Hike. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zarzar, Alan Arthur

Defendants

Hike, Teri

Robledo, Carlos Max

Peats, Jerome

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK, DENNIS P.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 10; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 10; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer; Description: estimated time of 20 minutes; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2017
  • Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Writ of Possession Returned (Satisfied) filed by Zarzar, Alan Arthur on 08/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Writ issued on 08/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Application for Writ of Possession filed by Zarzar, Alan Arthur on 08/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Court finding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Judgment for Zarzar, Alan Arthur against Hike, Teri ;Peats, Jerome in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 08/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Judgment by Court - After Trial (for Possession Only) filed by Zarzar, Alan Arthur on 08/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer heard 07/11/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2016
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Whole) filed by Robledo, Carlos on 06/06/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Robledo, Carlos Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Robledo, Carlos on 06/06/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Robledo, Carlos added as a Defendant effective 06/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Order Allowing Service of Summons by Posting and Mailing filed by Zarzar, Alan Arthur on 05/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (Forwarded to CR 10) received from Zarzar, Alan Arthur on 05/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zarzar, Alan Arthur on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Complaint filed by Zarzar, Alan Arthur on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Zarzar, Alan Arthur(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hike, Teri(Defendant) | Peats, Jerome(Defendant) | Robledo, Carlos(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less