This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 02:01:05 (UTC).

Adrian Melendez vs. Subaru of America Inc

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Adrian Melendez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Subaru of America Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melendez, Adrian

Defendant

Subaru of America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beck, Benjeman

Defendant Attorney

Ruggerello, Kristan L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Melendez, Adrian on 07/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: the Deposition of Defendants Person Most Qualified; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel - the Deposition of Defendants Person Most Qualified; Memorandum of Points and Authorities scheduled for 03/24/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Hearing on Motion to Compel the Deposition of Defendant's Person Most Qualified) filed by Melendez, Adrian on 03/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective Order) filed by Subaru of America Inc on 03/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective Order) submitted by Subaru of America Inc rejected on 02/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: the Deposition of Defendants Person Most Qualified; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to continue Motion to Compel Deposition of person most qualified. Continued to March 24 2022 in CR 40) filed by Subaru of America Inc; Melendez, Adrian on 01/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 11/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (the Deposition of Defendants Person Most Qualified; Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Melendez, Adrian on 11/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketOrder Remanding Case to Originating Court (Case #2:21-cv-02163-MCS-JC) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 05/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Subaru of America Inc on 03/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (Federal Case#2:21-cv-02163) filed by Subaru of America Inc on 03/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Subaru of America Inc on 03/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving CT Corp, Carlos Paz, SOP intake specialist on 02-09-21) filed by Melendez, Adrian on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Melendez, Adrian on 02/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Melendez, Adrian on 02/02/2021. Filed By: Melendez, Adrian(Plaintiff) Refers To: Subaru of America Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO KRISTAN LOUISE