This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 10/05/2022 at 02:01:55 (UTC).

Acevedo vs. Silver Star

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Acevedo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Silver Star. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acevedo, Ernesto

Defendants

General Motors LLC

Silver Star Motor Car Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colon, Maite C

Defendant Attorneys

Major, Cameron

Arens McBride, Mary Lynn

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Further Discovery Responses from Defendant and Request for Sanctions; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion to Compel heard 09/29/2022 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketThe Court takes this matter under submission as of 09/29/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Further Discovery Responses from Defendant and Request for Sanctions; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion to Compel heard 09/15/2022 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Further Discovery Responses from Defendant and Request for Sanctions scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Other (request to Set Trial Date or in the alternative set Case Management conference) filed by Acevedo, Ernesto on 07/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (LC) - scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by General Motors LLC on 04/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Silver Star Motor Car Company on 04/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Koy Saechao (Agent for CSC)) filed by Acevedo, Ernesto on 02/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Sarai Marin (CT Corp Agent)) filed by Acevedo, Ernesto on 02/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Acevedo, Ernesto on 12/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Acevedo, Ernesto on 12/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Acevedo, Ernesto on 12/06/2021. Filed By: Acevedo, Ernesto(Plaintiff) Refers To: General Motors LLC(Defendant) | Silver Star Motor Car Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAJOR CAMERON