This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/02/2023 at 03:02:40 (UTC).

5920 Melrose Avenue vs. Farmers Insurance

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 5920 Melrose Avenue filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Farmers Insurance. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

5920 Melrose Avenue LP

Dilorio, Richard

Defendants

Farmers Insurance Group Inc

Gomez, Galo

Gomez, Julio

Kito Enterprises LLC

Syverson, Nicole

Truck Insurance Exchange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gilbertson, Christina

Defendant Attorney

Alvarez, Sander

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference; Description: /OSC re Settlement/Dismissal; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference - /OSC re Settlement/Dismissal scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: Order to Show Cause RE: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Serve/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference heard 02/17/2023 08:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference - /OSC re Settlement/Dismissal scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Dilorio, Richard; 5920 Melrose Avenue LP on 02/16/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement (Filed No Later Than 3/24/23) filed by 5920 Melrose Avenue LP on 01/26/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - Order to Show Cause RE: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Serve/Default scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party submitted by 5920 Melrose Avenue LP rejected on 04/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal submitted by 5920 Melrose Avenue LP; Dilorio, Richard rejected on 04/08/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Truck Insurance Exchange on 02/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Daisy Montenegro Intake Specialist CT Corp) filed by 5920 Melrose Avenue LP on 02/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Daisy Montenegro Intake Specialist CT Corp) filed by 5920 Melrose Avenue LP on 02/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by 5920 Melrose Avenue LP; Dilorio, Richard on 09/24/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by 5920 Melrose Avenue LP; Dilorio, Richard on 09/24/2021. Filed By: 5920 Melrose Avenue LP(Plaintiff) | Dilorio, Richard(Plaintiff) Refers To: Farmers Insurance Group Inc(Defendant) | Syverson, Nicole(Defendant) | Kito Enterprises LLC(Defendant) | Gomez, Galo(Defendant) | Gomez, Julio(Defendant) | Truck Insurance Exchange(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less