This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 10:04:16 (UTC).

Zulema Scott, et al vs. K and M Custom Homes, et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Zulema Scott filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against K and M Custom Homes. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3736

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott, Zulema

Jimenez, Alvaro

Defendants

K and M Custom Homes

DOES 1 - 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, PAUL K.

Defendant Attorney

BUSTAMANTE, ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jimenez, Alvaro : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-052999-HOJ Jimenez, Alvaro $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jimenez, Alvaro : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jimenez, Alvaro : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-044631-HOJ Jimenez, Alvaro $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jimenez, Alvaro : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jimenez, Alvaro : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-027749-HOJ Jimenez, Alvaro $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jimenez, Alvaro : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Jimenez, Alvaro; Total Financial Assessment $735.00; Total Payments and Credits $735.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bustamante, Robert Maurice