This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 03:15:13 (UTC).

IN RE: NA ZHENG

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 IN RE NA ZHENG was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etezadi, Susan I, Etezadi, Susan I. and ETEZADI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3967

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

ETEZADI

Judges

Etezadi, Susan I

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ZHENG, NA

LAU, JENNA

 

Court Documents

Petition for Name Change.

Petition for Name Change

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Change of Name.

Order to Show Cause Change of Name

Notice of Change of Name Hearing.

Notice of Change of Name Hearing

Certificate of Publication re: Name Change.

Certificate of Publication re: Name Change

Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name.

*CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name.

*CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: ZHENG, NA

Decree Changing Name and/or Gender.

Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 10/26/17 New Name: JENNA LA Comment Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 10/26/17 New Name: JENNA LAU

Petition for Name Change.

Petition for Name Change

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Change of Name.

Order to Show Cause Change of Name

Notice of Change of Name Hearing.

Notice of Change of Name Hearing

Certificate of Publication re: Name Change.

Certificate of Publication re: Name Change

Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 10/25/2017 Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 10/26/2017 Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: ZHENG, NA

Decree Changing Name and/or Gender.

Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADIDate Signed: 10/26/17New Name: JENNA LA Comment Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 10/26/17 New Name: JENNA LAU

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Order; Party; Name; ZHENG, NA; Comment: NEW NAME: JENNA LAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZHENG, NA; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-074137-HOJ ZHENG, NA $76.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZHENG, NA; Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZHENG, NA; Transaction Assessment $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing Name and/or Gender.; Additional Info: Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADIDate Signed: 10/26/17New Name: JENNA LA Comment Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 10/26/17 New Name: JENNA LAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Change of Name.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 10/26/2017 Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: ZHENG, NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Change of Name.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 10/25/2017 Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Publication re: Name Change.; Additional Info: Certificate of Publication re: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Name Hearing.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Name Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Change of Name.; Additional Info: Order to Show Cause Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketOrder sent for signature to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Comment FILED SENT TO DEPT PJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZHENG, NA; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-060717-HOJ ZHENG, NA $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZHENG, NA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FinancialFinancial; ZHENG, NA; Total Financial Assessment $511.50; Total Payments and Credits $511.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition for Name Change File Date 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Name Change.; Additional Info: Petition for Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZHENG, NA is a litigant