This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/23/2022 at 14:02:19 (UTC).

ZAIDA BOWERS AND CORBETT BOWERS II

Case Summary

On 06/11/2015 ZAIDA BOWERS AND CORBETT BOWERS II was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANCHI, Franchi, Don R, Padilla, Jr., Rosendo and DON R. FRANCHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9421

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

FRANCHI

Franchi, Don R

Padilla, Jr., Rosendo

DON R. FRANCHI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOWERS, ZAIDA

Claimant

CALSTRS

Respondent

BOWERS, CORBETT HARVEY, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GUTIERREZ, OLIVER R

Respondent Attorney

MARQUEZ, MICHAEL E.

 

Court Documents

Further Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDARespondentAttorney: GARCIA-SEPULVEDA, FLORA

Further Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present RespondentAttorney: GARCIA-SEPULVEDA, FLORA

Further Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: DE ITA, NANCY LIGONRespondentAttorney: GARCIA-SEPULVEDA, FLORA

Further Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: DE ITA, NANCY LIGONRespondentAttorney: GARCIA-SEPULVEDA, FLORA

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/07/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDAAttorney: DE ITA, NANCY LIGONRespondentAttorney: GARCIA-SEPULVEDA, FLORA

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/07/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDARespondentAttorney: GARCIA-SEPULVEDA, FLORA

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order 01/10/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment ATTORNEY FEES Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDARespondent: BOWERS, CORBETT HARVEY, IIAttorney: Garcia-Sepulveda, Flora

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 01/10/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment to trail the hearing set on 1/10/18 @ 9:00 a.m. Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDARespondentAttorney: Garcia-Sepulveda, Flora

Motion hearings.

*FAM Minute Order - Motion hearings 02/09/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment NOTICE OF MOTION AND DECLARATION FOR JOINDER Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDA

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/08/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDAAttorney: GUTIERREZ, OLIVER RRespondent: BOWERS, CORBETT HARVEY, IIAttorney: GARCIA-SEPULVEDA, FLORAAttorney: Garcia-Sepulveda, Flora

Request for Order RE: Spousal Support.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order RE: Spousal Support 06/01/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment AND ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDAAttorney: GUTIERREZ, OLIVER RRespondent: BOWERS, CORBETT HARVEY, IIAttorney: GARCIA-SEPULVEDA, FLORA

Court Trial - Short Cause.

*FAM Minute Order - Court Trial - Short Cause 07/12/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment 3 hour time est. Parties Present Petitioner: BOWERS, ZAIDAAttorney: GUTIERREZ, OLIVER RRespondent: BOWERS, CORBETT HARVEY, IIAttorney: Garcia-Sepulveda, Flora

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Padilla Jr., Rosendo Hearing Time 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketConference.; Additional Info: Original Type Conference Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Mandatory Settlement Conference Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Status Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Family Law Status Conference Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice to Appear By Zoom.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: SENT LTR AND COPY OF ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER *.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Comment O: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER:COURT NEED SMORE INFORMATION SIGNED BY JUDGE FRANCHI ON 06/15/15, FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketOrder sent for signature to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Comment OFS: ORDER SENT TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR SIGNATURE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 06/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ZAIDA BOWERS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY ZAIDA BOWERS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALSTRS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARQUEZ, MICHAEL E.