Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 15:51:00 (UTC).

YOUSFA EID vs. TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. a corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 YOUSFA EID filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U S A , INC a corporation. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weiner, Marie S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1711

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weiner, Marie S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EID, YOUSFA

Defendants

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. a corporation

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSE, ADAM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EID, YOUSFA : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-012368-HOJ EID, YOUSFA $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EID, YOUSFA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: EID, YOUSFA; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSE ADAM MORRIS