This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 22:24:57 (UTC).

YOLANDA GLORIA VS DENNIS MAYER

Case Summary

On 06/28/2012 YOLANDA GLORIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DENNIS MAYER. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cretan, Clifford V, Novak, Lisa A, Novak, Lisa A., Cretan, Clifford V., Grandsaert, John L, CLIFFORD V. CRETAN and LISA A. NOVAK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5058

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cretan, Clifford V

Novak, Lisa A

Novak, Lisa A.

Cretan, Clifford V.

Grandsaert, John L

CLIFFORD V. CRETAN

LISA A. NOVAK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLORIA, YOLANDA

Defendant

MAYER, DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, DAVID L

Defendant Attorney

MCSHANE, BRIAN J.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Cretan Clifford V Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (2) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS MAYER.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DEFENDANT. FILED.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ORDER Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 04/12/13

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY YOLANDA GLORIA.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DEFENDANT. FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DEFENDANT., FILED.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 04/12/13 Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 04/12/13

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS MAYER. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS MAYER.

Conversion Action.

PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YOLANDA GLORIA. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YOLANDA GLORIA.

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Cretan Clifford V. Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS MAYER. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DENNIS MAYER.

Notice.

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY YOLANDA GLORIA. Comment N: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY YOLANDA GLORIA.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketSettlement Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; MAYER, DENNIS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; GLORIA, YOLANDA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DEFENDANT. FILED. Comment FILED: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DEFENDANT., FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment ADRMEO: MEDIATION WITH KEVIN KELLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 04/12/13 Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 04/12/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: STIP & ORDER TO ADR RECEIVED AND SENT TO DEPT 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF GLORIA SERVED ON DENNIS MAYER WITH SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF GLORIA SERVED ON DENNIS MAYER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for GLORIA, YOLANDA; Case Payment Receipt # 201206290213 GLORIA, YOLANDA $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for GLORIA, YOLANDA; Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; GLORIA, YOLANDA; Total Financial Assessment $545.00; Total Payments and Credits $545.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/28/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120629-0213-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

BRANCH NAME

PLAINTIFF: YOLANDA GLORIA JUN 2 8 2012

[ ] ACTIONIS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [ | does not exceed $10,000

[ ] exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) | [ -] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint | [_] from limited to unlimited [_] from unlimited to limited

1. Plaintiff (name or names): YOLANDA GLORIA alleges causes of action against defendant (name or names): DENNIS MAYER

CASE NUMBER.

CiV 9519098

2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 3. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult a. [__] except plaintiff (name): (1) ] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] a public entity (describe): (4) [_] aminor [__] an adult (a) [__] for whom a guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad litem has been appointed (b) [ other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify): b. [_] except plaintiff (name): (1) [__] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) (] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [__] aminor [_] an adult (a) [__] for whom a guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad litem has been appointed (b) ] other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify):

[} Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3.

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE" CASE NUMBER:

GLORIA v. MAYER

4. [] Plaintiff (name): is doing business under the fictitious name (specify).

and has complied with the fictitious business name laws. 5. Each defendant named above is a natural person

a. [__| except defendant (name): c. [__] except defendant (name): (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (1) [__] a business organization, form unknown (2) [__] a corporation (2) [__] a corporation (3) [___] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [__] a public entity (describe): (5) [_] other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify):

b. [__] except defendant (name): d. [_] except defendant (name): (1) [__] a business organization, form unknown (1) [__] a business organization, form unknown (2) [__] a corporation (2) [__] a corporation (3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) (] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (5) [_] other (specify): (5) {__] other (specify):

e Infonnatiofi about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 5.

6. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff. a. Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers):. 1-10 were the agents or employees of other named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment. b. Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): 11-25 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff. 7. [[__] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

8. This court is the proper court because

a. [__] atleast one defendant now resides in its jurisdictional area. . [[_] the principal place of business of a defendant corporation or unincorporated association is in its jurisdictional area. injury to person or damage to personal property occurred in its jurisdictional area.

. ] other (specify):

9. [_] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [__| has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [_] is excused from complying because (specify):

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCSHANE, BRIAN J.