This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:39 (UTC).

YASI HATAMI vs. JONATHAN GARCIA CALVILLO

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 YASI HATAMI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONATHAN GARCIA CALVILLO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Duesdieker, George. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0727

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Duesdieker, George

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HATAMI, YASI

Defendant

CALVILLO, JONATHAN GARCIA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Person served: JANE DOE Costs: Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: JANE DOE Costs: 75.00 Hearing Date:

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/23/2018 Judicial Officer Duesdieker George Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: HATAMI, YASI

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Duesdieker George; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: HATAMI, YASI; Awarded Against: CALVILLO, JONATHAN GARCIA; Amount; Damages: $648.55; Costs: $105.00; Total: $753.55; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT.; Party; Names: HATAMI, YASI; CALVILLO, JONATHAN GARCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • No Longer Under Submission.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Matter Taken Under Submission. Additional Info: Comment Matter under submission: Decision Judicial officer: G. Duesdieker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem. Additional Info: Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 07/23/2018 Judicial Officer Duesdieker George Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: HATAMI, YASI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: JANE DOECosts: Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: JANE DOE Costs: 75.00 Hearing Date: 07/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for HATAMI, YASI : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037349-HOJ HATAMI, YASI $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for HATAMI, YASI : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: HATAMI, YASI; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less