This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 05:32:09 (UTC).

XIAOXIAO REN vs. RED CUBE STUDIO, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2016 XIAOXIAO REN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RED CUBE STUDIO, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0898

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REN, XIAOXIAO

Defendants

DOES 1-10

RED CUBE PRODUCITON, INC.

WU, HAIPING

YU, YANGHAO

RED CUBE STUDIO, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, MAN LU, APPARENTLY IN CHARGE Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, MAN LU, APPARENTLY IN CHARGE

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, MAN LU, APPARENTLY IN CHARGE Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, MAN LU, APPARENTLY IN CHARGE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CASE DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 11-1-16).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc.. Additional Info: Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, MAN LU, APPARENTLY IN CHARGE Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, MAN LU, APPARENTLY IN CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc.. Additional Info: Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, MAN LU, APPARENTLY IN CHARGE Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, MAN LU, APPARENTLY IN CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial info for REN, XIAOXIAO : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-035737-HOJ REN, XIAOXIAO $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial info for REN, XIAOXIAO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Financial: REN, XIAOXIAO; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less