This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:43 (UTC).

XENIYA LARINA AND RAVINDZAN NADAZAJAH

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 XENIYA LARINA AND RAVINDZAN NADAZAJAH was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8191

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LARINA, XENIYA

Respondent

NADAZAJAH, RAVINDZAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: NADAZAJAH RAVINDZAN; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: LARINA, XENIYA; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment MSE: MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 06/13/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Comment JNM: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED; MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 06/13/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Comment DDUJ: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED FROM 32 TO 23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JFDE: JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DOCUMENT EXAMINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Request to enter default filed. Additional Info: Comment RDDEF: (FL) REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF LARINA AS TO RAVINDZAN NADAZAJAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment JR: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Default Received.. Additional Info: Comment DR: DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment DRSDD: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY XENIYA LARINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Case assigned to Department for all purposes. Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 32 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY XENIYA LARINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0842-CS 184/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for LARINA, XENIYA : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260842 LARINA, XENIYA $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for LARINA, XENIYA : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: LARINA, XENIYA; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less