This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 11:13:52 (UTC).

Woodbridge Construction, Inc. vs. Enrique N. Ayala, et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Woodbridge Construction, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Enrique N Ayala,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, Halperin, Ernst A and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3864

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Halperin, Ernst A

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Woodbridge Construction, Inc.

Defendants

Ayala, Elizabeth A.

Ayala, Enrique N.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER, RICHARD J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC Re: Dismissal - 3/28/2022 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF Comment OSC Re: Dismissal - 3/28/2022 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

3833584_151summons09

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

3833584_319civilcase

Complaint.

3833584_216verifiedc

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 03/28/2022 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC Re: Dismissal - 3/28/2022 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF Comment OSC Re: Dismissal - 3/28/2022 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; Woodbridge Construction, Inc.; Ayala, Enrique N.; Ayala, Elizabeth A.; DOES 1 TO 10; Comment: FILED ON 4/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Attorney Ruby Bitzer for Defendants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 03/28/2022 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC Re: Dismissal - 3/28/2022 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF Comment OSC Re: Dismissal - 3/28/2022 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Comment CMC 1/26/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Woodbridge Construction, Inc.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-035024-HOJ Woodbridge Construction, Inc. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Woodbridge Construction, Inc.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Woodbridge Construction, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/09/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less