This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:56:37 (UTC).

WILLIAM PHILLIPS AND MARTHA AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 WILLIAM PHILLIPS AND MARTHA AGUILAR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hill, Elizabeth M, Hill, Elizabeth M. and Jakubowski, Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8644

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hill, Elizabeth M

Hill, Elizabeth M.

Jakubowski, Susan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHILLIPS, WILLIAM RAY

Respondent

AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA

 

Court Documents

Family Law Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Hill Elizabeth M. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Parties Present Respondent: AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Jakubowski Susan; Judgment Type; Judgment; Comment; Comment; ().

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal. Additional Info: Comment Separation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Judgment returned to Clerk's Office for processing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Judgment sent to Department. Additional Info: Comment 29 for signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Stipulation. Additional Info: Comment Waiver of 5 Year Mandatory Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Stipulation & Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Appearance Stipulations & Waivers.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment Preliminary Declaration of Disclosure and Income & Expense Declaration filed

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Case assigned to Department for all purposes. Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 32 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY WILLIAM RAY PHILLIPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Financial info for AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-068404-HOJ AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Financial info for AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA : Transaction Assessment $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Financial info for AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Financial info for AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA : Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Financial info for AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Financial: AGUILAR, MARTHA ANGELICA; Total Financial Assessment $872.00; Total Payments and Credits $437.00

    Read MoreRead Less