This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/07/2022 at 00:04:19 (UTC).

WILLIAM MOIMOI ETU vs. WELLS FARGO, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 WILLIAM MOIMOI ETU filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against WELLS FARGO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHOU and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6427

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

CHOU

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ETU, WILLIAM MOIMOI

Defendants

WELLS FARGO

REO GROUP

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO DEPT. 22 ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Comment DEPT. 22 ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Fee Waiver Granted.

Fee Waiver Granted Signed by JUDGE CHOU on 12/06/2021 Comment Signed by JUDGE CHOU on 12/06/2021

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ETU, WILLIAM MOIMOI; Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ETU, WILLIAM MOIMOI; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; ETU, WILLIAM MOIMOI; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver Granted.; Additional Info: Fee Waiver Granted Signed by JUDGE CHOU on 12/06/2021 Comment Signed by JUDGE CHOU on 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REO GROUP is a litigant