Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 16:58:03 (UTC).

WENDY CERON VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED vs Medical Linen Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 WENDY CERON VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against Medical Linen Service, Inc. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3233

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WENDY CERON VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

Medical Linen Service, Inc.

DOES 1 THRU 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZAMET, KELSEY M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Re: CMO #1 filed by Plaintiff Comment Re: CMO #1 filed by Plaintiff

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Re: CMO #1 Comment Re: CMO #1

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference.

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference on 09/17/21 at 2:00 pm. Comment on 09/17/21 at 2:00 pm.

Notice.

Notice NOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TR Comment NOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation.

Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Re: CMO #1 filed by Plaintiff Comment Re: CMO #1 filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing Re: CMO #1 Comment Re: CMO #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order. Additional Info: Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Complex Case Status Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Complex Case Status Conference on 09/17/21 at 2:00 pm. Comment on 09/17/21 at 2:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice NOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TR Comment NOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WENDY CERON VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WENDY CERON VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023494-HOJ Ceron Ventura, Wendy $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for WENDY CERON VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED : Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: WENDY CERON VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED; Total Financial Assessment $2,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Re: Complex Case Designation. Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medical Linen Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZAMET, KELSEY M.