This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 17:48:12 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA vs. ADRIENNE SALAS

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADRIENNE SALAS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3761

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

Defendant

SALAS, ADRIENNE

Half Moon Bay, CA 94019-1774

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YVETTE, CLAUDIA

Defendant Attorney

LE, SYLVANNA UYEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; DECLARATION REGA Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; DECLARATION REGARDING STATEMENT OF VENUE

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER PROOF OF SERVICE Comment ANSWER, PROOF OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SALAS, ADRIENNE; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-036858-HOJ SALAS, ADRIENNE $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SALAS, ADRIENNE; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; SALAS, ADRIENNE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER PROOF OF SERVICE Comment ANSWER, PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; DECLARATION REGA Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; DECLARATION REGARDING STATEMENT OF VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WELLS FARGO BANK, NA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-033764-HOJ Wells Fargo Bank, Na $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WELLS FARGO BANK, NA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; WELLS FARGO BANK, NA; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue.; Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE, SYLVANNA UYEN