This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/31/2022 at 04:32:14 (UTC).

WALID AHMED A FAQIHI vs. NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 WALID AHMED A FAQIHI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Borja, Hugo R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0155

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Borja, Hugo R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAQIHI, WALID AHMED A

Defendant

NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered PLAINTIFFS CLAIMReason: REFUSED UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment PLAINTIFFS CLAIM Reason: REFUSED UNABLE TO FORWARD

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE Comment Costs: 0.0 Hearing Date: 10/29/22

Small Claims Hearing.

Original Type Small Claims Hearing ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 10/29/2021 Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: FAQIHI, WALID AHMED A

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered PLAINTIFFS CLAIMReason: REFUSED UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment PLAINTIFFS CLAIM Reason: REFUSED UNABLE TO FORWARD

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE Costs: 0.0Hearing Date: 10/29/22 Comment Costs: 0.0 Hearing Date: 10/29/22

Small Claims Hearing.

Original Type Small Claims Hearing ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 10/29/2021 Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: FAQIHI, WALID AHMED A

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19

Mail returned undelivered.

Mail returned undelivered CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARINGReason: UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Small Claims - Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned undelivered.; Additional Info: Mail returned undelivered CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARINGReason: UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING Reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19.; Additional Info: Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDecision Sheet.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Small Claims Hearing ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 10/29/2021 Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: FAQIHI, WALID AHMED A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE Costs: 0.0Hearing Date: 10/29/22 Comment Costs: 0.0 Hearing Date: 10/29/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned undelivered.; Additional Info: Mail returned undelivered PLAINTIFFS CLAIMReason: REFUSED UNABLE TO FORWARD Comment PLAINTIFFS CLAIM Reason: REFUSED UNABLE TO FORWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FAQIHI, WALID AHMED A; Case Payment Receipt # 2021-012787-HOJ FAQIHI, WALID AHMED A $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FAQIHI, WALID AHMED A; Transaction Assessment $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; FAQIHI, WALID AHMED A; Total Financial Assessment $75.00; Total Payments and Credits $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 04/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim.; Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY is a litigant