This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 21:00:40 (UTC).

VICTOR ALBAUM VS CHHAVI METAH,M.D.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2014 VICTOR ALBAUM filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CHHAVI METAH,M D. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Novak, Lisa A, Dylina, Steven L., Novak, Lisa A., LISA A. NOVAK, NOVAK and STEVEN L. DYLINA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6110

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Novak, Lisa A

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

LISA A. NOVAK

NOVAK

STEVEN L. DYLINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VICTOR ALBAUM

San Mateo, CA 94402

ALBAUM, VICTOR

Defendants

CHHAVI METAH,M.D.

METAH,M.D., CHHAVI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAFFE, JUDIANNE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (2) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D..

Notice.

NOTICE (2) Comment N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEF CHHAVI MEHTA MD'S MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D..

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF MARCELL P. NERI ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D..

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF ALBAUM SERVED ON CHHAVI METAHM.D. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/07/14.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND DEFT'S ANSWER (W/NO ORDER) FILED. Comment FILED: STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND DEFT'S ANSWER (W/NO ORDER), FILED.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VICTOR ALBAUM. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VICTOR ALBAUM.

Notice.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEF CHHAVI MEHTA MD'S MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D. Comment N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEF CHHAVI MEHTA MD'S MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY CHHAVI METAH,M.D..

Substitution of Attorney as to.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY PRO/PER REMOVED AS TO VICTOR ALBAUM AND REPLACED WI Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY PRO/PER REMOVED AS TO VICTOR ALBAUM AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY JUDIANNE JAFFE.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D.. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHHAVI METAH,M.D..

Order.

ORDER GRANTING DEF CHHAVI MEHTA MD'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTF'S SIGNED BY JUDGE NOVAK ON Comment O2: ORDER GRANTING DEF CHHAVI MEHTA MD'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTF'S, SIGNED BY JUDGE NOVAK ON 05/08/14 FILED.

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Amended.

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D.. Comment AMEN: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY CHHAVI METAH,M.D..

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2014
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; METAH,M.D., CHHAVI; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; ALBAUM, VICTOR; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment COM1: - 1 -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY C LYSSAND ON 06/06/14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: THE COURT IS INFORMED A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL HAS BEEN SUBMITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment AT: ATTORNEY(S): MARCEL NERI APPEARED ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment AT: ATTORNEY(S): JUDIANNE JAFFE APPEARED BY COURTCALL ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Comment JCR1: HONORABLE STEVEN L. DYLINA, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: CHERYL LYSSAND. COURT REPORTER: NONE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketFirst Paper Fee Paid.; Additional Info: Comment FFP: FIRST PAPER FEE PAID BY CHHAVI METAHM.D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHHAVI METAHM.D.. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHHAVI METAH,M.D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF ALBAUM SERVED ON CHHAVI METAHM.D. WITH SER Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF ALBAUM SERVED ON CHHAVI METAH,M.D. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/07/14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver Granted.; Additional Info: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY VICTOR ALBAUM GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 SIG Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY VICTOR ALBAUM GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00, SIGNED BY CLERK, HENRY CAJBON ON 01/07/14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY VICTOR ALBAUM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAFFE JUDIANNE ESQ