This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 00:09:53 (UTC).

VERONICA ROMERO vs. FRANK RICHARD GARCIA, et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 VERONICA ROMERO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANK RICHARD GARCIA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0644

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMERO, VERONICA

Defendants

GARCIA, FRANK RICHARD

STEVE MOREY TRANSPORT, INC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECK, MITCHELL P

Defendant Attorney

DEA, MNARK T

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC Order Continue - Not Yet at Issue CMC Order Continue - Not Yet at Issue Comment No answer

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC Order Continue - Not Yet at Issue CMC Order Continue - Not Yet at Issue Comment No answer

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC Order Continue - Not Yet at Issue CMC Order Continue - Not Yet at Issue Comment No answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROMERO, VERONICA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-021378-HOJ ROMERO, VERONICA $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROMERO, VERONICA; Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees.; Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, FRANK RICHARD; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-021244-HOJ GARCIA, FRANK RICHARD $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, FRANK RICHARD; Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROMERO, VERONICA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-006431-HOJ Romero, Veronica $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROMERO, VERONICA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; ROMERO, VERONICA; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less