This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 04:24:32 (UTC).

VERONICA ARTEAGA ROLDAN vs. MCENG ENTERPRISES, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 VERONICA ARTEAGA ROLDAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MCENG ENTERPRISES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, Joseph C, Foiles, Robert D, Scott, Joseph C. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0464

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, Joseph C

Foiles, Robert D

Scott, Joseph C.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

MCENG ENTERPRISES INC-MCDONALD'S

ROLDAN, VERONICA ARTEAGA

MARTINEZ, YASICA

MCENG ENTERPRISES

DOES 1-30, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARABI, PARVIZ

Defendant Attorney

GELLER, JASON A

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Notice.

Notice OF POSTING JURY FEES Comment OF POSTING JURY FEES

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Scott Joseph C Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: DARABI, PARVIZ

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice OF JURY FEE Comment OF JURY FEE

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (CASE DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 3-28-17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Jury trial time estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION Comment WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • ADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 21 ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice OF POSTING JURY FEES Comment OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for MCENG ENTERPRISES : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-059575-HOJ NATIONWIDE LEGAL $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Financial info for MCENG ENTERPRISES : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Financial info for MCENG ENTERPRISES : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-049755-HOJ MCENG ENTERPRISES $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Financial info for MCENG ENTERPRISES : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Financial: MCENG ENTERPRISES; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for ROLDAN, VERONICA ARTEAGA : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-052363-HOJ ROLDAN, VERONICA ARTEAGA $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for ROLDAN, VERONICA ARTEAGA : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Financial info for ROLDAN, VERONICA ARTEAGA : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-028610-HOJ VISUAL DATA RESEACH THERESA HARVEY $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Financial info for ROLDAN, VERONICA ARTEAGA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Financial: ROLDAN, VERONICA ARTEAGA; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less