This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:45:07 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC vs. LUIS LOMELI, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUIS LOMELI. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L. and Buchwald, Gerald J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2789

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L.

Buchwald, Gerald J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

LOMELI, LUIS

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK, BROOKE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/03/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE SIDUGUEN REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF Comment DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE SIDUGUEN REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; PROPOSED ORDER

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 11/7/18 Comment CMC 11/7/18

Complaint.

Complaint

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names: VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC; LOMELI, LUIS; DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE; Comment; Comment; (DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Buchwald Gerald J. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support. Additional Info: Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE SIDUGUEN REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF Comment DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE SIDUGUEN REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 11/7/18 Comment CMC 11/7/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/03/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue. Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037355-HOJ PARK, BROOKE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less