This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 21:12:12 (UTC).

USS CAL BUILDERS, INC. vs SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 USS CAL BUILDERS, INC filed an Other lawsuit against SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, Etezadi, Susan I and Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2834

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Etezadi, Susan I

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

USS CAL BUILDERS, INC.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

USS CAL BUILDERS, INC.

ALLIED FRAMERS, INC.

ZELCO ENTERPRISES, INC.

WATERPROOFING ASSOCIATES, INC.

TRINET CONSTRUCTION, INC.

RICHARD HANCOCK, INC.

TRIDENT INSTALLATIONS

MARKEN MECHANICAL SERVICES, INC.

LANDMARK MODERNIZATION CONTRACTORS, INC

LARRATT BROS. PLUMBING, INC.

MADDEN & NELSON, INC.

BAY CITIES FIRE PROTECTION, INC.

DINELLI PLUMBING INCORPORATED

DBA GOLDEN STATE FRAMERS

JERRY THOMPSON & SONS PAINTING, INC.

SYSERCO, INC.

MOES 1 THROUGH 200

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

FELDMAN, MARK A

SOUZA, JAMES P

LITTON, KENNETH I

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KELLY, MARK

FELDMAN, MARK A

SOUZA, JAMES P

LITTON, KENNETH I

SCHELEY, L. THEODORE

SWEENEY, JOSEPH M.

LEVY, DAVID M.

CAMPBELL, PATRICK J

LINN, PETER J.

ELZA, LAURIE J.

HILL, JOHN T

Other Attorneys

COTTLE, SEAN A

KO, LYDIA V

SHAMBAUGH, CYNTHIA

GIAMPAOLI, MATTHEW D

BOHM, JAMES G

LETULLE, JENNIFER K.

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Refund.

Request for Refund OF $1435.00 ANSWER AND CIVIL COMPLEX FEE. CASE COORDINATED WITH CASE IN SAN FRA Comment OF $1435.00, ANSWER AND CIVIL COMPLEX FEE. CASE COORDINATED WITH CASE IN SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT

Answer.

Answer OF HMC ARCHITECTS TO PROJECT FROG INC.'S SECOND ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment OF HMC ARCHITECTS TO PROJECT FROG, INC.'S SECOND ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) ANSWER TO USS CAL BUILDERS INC.'S UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO USS CAL BUILDERS, INC.'S UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS COMPLAINT; NORA KICKEY - Comment SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS COMPLAINT; NORA KICKEY - AGENT FOR SERVICE

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. FROG, INC'S ANSWER TO THE UNVERFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF US Comment FROG, INC'S ANSWER TO THE UNVERFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF USS CAL BUILDERS, INC., ; USS CAL BUILDERS, INC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT; SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST USS CAL BUILDERS, INC.; COMPLAINT; CASEMANAGEMENT ORDER #1 AND ORDER FOR PERMISSIVE E-FILING AS TO ROBIN MAXWELL, AGENT FOR SERVICE

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney LARRATT BROS. PLUMBING INC. S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Comment LARRATT BROS. PLUMBING, INC. S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Request for Refund.

Request for Refund OF $1435.00 ANSWER AND CIVIL COMPLEX FEE. CASE COORDINATED WITH CASE IN SAN FRA Comment OF $1435.00, ANSWER AND CIVIL COMPLEX FEE. CASE COORDINATED WITH CASE IN SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT

Answer.

Answer OF HMC ARCHITECTS TO PROJECT FROG INC.'S SECOND ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment OF HMC ARCHITECTS TO PROJECT FROG, INC.'S SECOND ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice 7 AND 8 CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY Comment Without Prejudice 7 AND 8 CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY

Notice.

Notice OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE Comment OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE

Notice.

Notice Notice of Association of Counsel For Project Frog Inc. received by department 18 Comment Notice of Association of Counsel For Project Frog, Inc. received by department 18

Notice.

Notice OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PROJECT FROG INC. Comment OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PROJECT FROG, INC.

Notice.

Notice OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE Comment OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE

295 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Attorney.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Address of Attorney LARRATT BROS. PLUMBING INC. S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Comment LARRATT BROS. PLUMBING, INC. S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketDisbursement.; Additional Info: Comment Processed Disbursement Other of $1435.00 to COLLIN COLLIN MUIR & STEWART LLP Doc/Ref 1909697216

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Refund.; Additional Info: Request for Refund OF $1435.00 ANSWER AND CIVIL COMPLEX FEE. CASE COORDINATED WITH CASE IN SAN FRA Comment OF $1435.00, ANSWER AND CIVIL COMPLEX FEE. CASE COORDINATED WITH CASE IN SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer.; Additional Info: Answer OF HMC ARCHITECTS TO PROJECT FROG INC.'S SECOND ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment OF HMC ARCHITECTS TO PROJECT FROG, INC.'S SECOND ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name; SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; Comment; Comment: (JMW CARPET AND FLOORING, INC.'S CAUSES OF ACTION 7 & 8 AGAINTS SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO ONLY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice 7 AND 8 CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY Comment Without Prejudice 7 AND 8 CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketAdvanced Jury Fee Defendant Non-Refundable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE Comment OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice Notice of Association of Counsel For Project Frog Inc. received by department 18 Comment Notice of Association of Counsel For Project Frog, Inc. received by department 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Related Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for USS CAL BUILDERS, INC.; Case Payment Receipt # 2016-066418-HOJ FELDMAN, MARK A $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for USS CAL BUILDERS, INC.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; USS CAL BUILDERS, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/14/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less