This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 11:20:55 (UTC).

UNITED AIRLINES, INC. vs. COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 UNITED AIRLINES, INC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L., Karesh, Jonathan E., Davis, III, Leland, Greenberg, Susan, Swope, V. Raymond, Fineman, Nancy L., Fineman, Nancy L, Karesh, Jonathan E, Grandsaert, John L and Swope, V. Raymond, Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5971

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Davis, III, Leland

Greenberg, Susan

Swope, V. Raymond

Fineman, Nancy L.

Fineman, Nancy L

Karesh, Jonathan E

Grandsaert, John L

Swope, V. Raymond, Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED AIRLINES, INC.

Defendant

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAELS, PETER, ESQ

MICHAELS, PETER

Defendant Attorney

ARCHER, REBECCA M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Court Hearing.

Notice of Court Hearing Notice of CMC set for 11/1/18 Comment Notice of CMC set for 11/1/18

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Stipulation.

Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND COMPLAINT Comment FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Motion to Continue Trial Date.

*CIV Minute Order - Motion to Continue Trial Date 04/23/2019 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: MICHAELS, PETER, ESQDefendantAttorney: ARCHER, REBECCA M

Statement.

Statement COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL Comment COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Order.

Order TO SEAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS Comment TO SEAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS

Amended Judgment.

Amended Judgment

Statement of Decision.

Statement of Decision Comment FOLLOWING TRIAL

Order.

Order STATEMENT OF DECISION FOLLOWING TRIAL Comment STATEMENT OF DECISION FOLLOWING TRIAL

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR UNOPPOSD MOTION TO SEAL FWD TO DEPT 23 FOR A Comment FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR UNOPPOSD MOTION TO SEAL, FWD TO DEPT 23 FOR APPROVAL ON 1/14/2021

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder. Additional Info: Order TO SEAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS Comment TO SEAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of AMENDED JUDGMENT Comment AMENDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment/Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order NOTICE OF ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received TO SEAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. FORWARDED TO DEPT 23. Comment TO SEAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. FORWARDED TO DEPT 23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Judgment. Additional Info: Amended Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketTentative ruling adopted and becomes order:. Additional Info: Comment Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to seal portions of the administration record generated in conjunction with Plaintiffs' applications for a changed assessment presented to the San Mateo County Assessment Appeals Board is GRANTED. Plaintiffs have now addressed the factors set forth in CRC 2.550(d). Plaintiffs have demonstrated the records they seek to seal contain proprietary or confidential information. The records consist of testimony and documents furnished to the San Mateo County Assessment Appeals Board in conjunction with an application for changed assessment. Complaint 10. Plaintiffs cite to Rev. and Tax. Code 451, which provides that "All information requested by the assessor or furnished in the property statement shall be held secret by the assessor. The statement is not a public document and is not open to inspection, except as provided in Section 408." According to Plaintiffs, this section requires that the documents must be kept confidential. Plaintiffs have not provided any authority indicating that the confidentiality of "property statements" under Section 451 includes testimony and documents furnished to the Assessment Appeals Board in conjunction with an assessment appeal. In any case, however, Section 451 indicates that parties have a general privacy interest in evidence submitted in conjunction with a property assessment. The Court finds that (1) There exists an overriding interest that overcomes the right of public access to the record; (2) The overriding interest supports sealing the record; (3) A substantial probability exists that the overriding interest will be prejudiced if the record is not sealed; (4) The proposed sealing is narrowly tailored; and (5) No less restrictive means exist to achieve the overriding interest. CRC Rule 2.550. The clerk of the court is hereby ordered to seal the following portions of the administrative record: A. Bates #AAB_000649-000708 B. Bates #AAB_001996-002000 C. Bates #AAB_002181-002298 D. Bates #AAB_002333-002362 E. Bates #AAB_002363-002443 F. Bates #AAB_002444-002505 The sealed portion of the file will not be made available for public inspection. Neither this order, nor the register of actions, nor any other court records shall be sealed pursuant to this order. This order does not authorize any parties other than the Court to inspect the sealed record. If the tentative ruling is uncontested, it shall become the order of the Court. Thereafter, counsel for Plaintiffs shall prepare a written order consistent with the Court's ruling for the Court's signature, pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1312, and provide written notice of the ruling to all parties who have appeared in the action, as required by law and the California Rules of Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Seal. Additional Info: Original Type Motion to Seal ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Seal 03/15/2021 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of JUDGMENT Comment JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for UNITED AIRLINES, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-087996-HOJ WHEELS OF JUSTICE, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for UNITED AIRLINES, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: UNITED AIRLINES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $1,099.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,099.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

JOHN C. BEIERS, COUNTY COUNSEL (SBN 144282)

By: Rebecca M. Archer, Lead Deputy (SBN 202743)

Hall of Justice and Records _

400 County Center, 6™ Floor | |

Redwood City, CA 94063 ‘ Telephone: (650) 363-4686 .

Facsli)mile: (650) 363-4034E-mail: rmarcher@smcgov.org | SAN MATEO COUNTY -

Attorneys for Defendant

Exempt from filing fees pursuant to Government Code § 6103 '

IN THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

"'UNITED AIRLINES, INC., | Case No. 17-CIV-05971 Plaintiff, | DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN MATEOQ’S

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S VERIFIED

vs. COMPLAINT FOR REFUND OF

PROPERTY TAXES

COUNTY OF SAN MATEQOQ, a Political Subdivision of the State of California,

Defendant

7~ 17-CIV-05971 ARDU

Answer (Unlimited)

AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1. As a first, separate and distinct affirmative defense, County alleges that the Complaint fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action upon which relief can be granted. Case No. 17-CIV-05971 4

1. As a first, separate and distinct affirmative defense, County alleges that the Complaint fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action upon which relief can be granted. Case No. 17-CIV-05971 4 'WHEREFORE, defendant, County of San Mateo prays for judgment as follows:

'WHEREFORE, defendant, County of San Mateo prays for judgment as follows:

1. That the Court enter judgment in favor of the County denying all relief requested in the Complaint;

2. That Plaintiff take nothing by its action;

3. That County recover its costs of suit incurred herein; and

4. For such other and further relief as the court deems proper and just.

Dated: 6/?0/ LQ

Case No. 17-CIV-05971

Respectfully submitted,

. BEIERS, COUNTY COUNSEL

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant