This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 16:35:49 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR VS SUAIMA BARAJAS

Case Summary

On 01/03/2013 UNIFUND CCR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUAIMA BARAJAS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8842

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendants

SUAIMA BARAJAS

BARAJAS, SUAIMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIGUEL, CHRISTOPHER A

QUALL, MATTHEW W

 

Court Documents

Notice.

NOTICE (28) Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR LLC.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY UNIFUND CCR LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $102.72, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION REGARDING THE COMPUTATION OF ATTORNEYS' FEES

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION REGARDING THE COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

Conversion Action.

WAIVER (2) Comment WF: WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC AS TO SUAIMA BARAJAS.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 08/24/2016 Amount: 14662.3 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 08/24/2016 Amount: 14662.33

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 290 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 2905.05.

Document.

FILING (20) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 01/23/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Conversion Action.

WAIVER Comment WF: WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10 % FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment D1033: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY UNIFUND CCR LLC

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC SERVED ON SUAIMA BARAJAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/11/13.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION REGARDING STATEMENT OF VENUE

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: UNIFUND CCR LLC; Awarded Against: BARAJAS SUAIMA; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 01/23/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC FOR UNIFUND CCR LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST SUAIMA BARAJAS PRINCIPAL IS $8,574.07. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $800.00. INTEREST IS $2,074.21. COSTS ARE $284.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $11,732.28.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Return. Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 08/24/2016 Amount: 14662.3 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 08/24/2016 Amount: 14662.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Writ Issued. Additional Info: Comment SAN MATEO;14662.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 290 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 2905.05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (20) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment REJ: WRIT OF EXECUTION REJECTED BECAUSE LINE #12 ON WRIT OF EXECUTION DOES NOT MATCH YOUR MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment UA: ATTORNEY RECORD UPDATED TO SHOW CHRISTOPHER A MIGUEL ATTORNEY FOR UNIFUND CCR LLC UPDATED/CORRECTED TO MATTHEW W QUALL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: NOTICE (28) Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140506-0129-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION REGARDING STATEMENT OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130103-0275-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC : Mail Payment Receipt # 2016-038907-HOJ UNIFUND CCR LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201301030275 UNIFUND CCR LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • Financial: UNIFUND CCR LLC; Total Financial Assessment $250.00; Total Payments and Credits $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

: PLD-C-001 ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Narme, State Bar number, and address) Matthew W. Quall, 183759 Manuel E. Ignacio, 279191 Christopher A. Miguel 283127 Lang, Richert & Patch 5200 NORTH PALM AVE, Suite 401 FRESNO, CA 93704

TELEPHONE NO. (888) 564-6118 ::3:”:,,%,). (559)-228-6727

E-MAIL ADDRESS F I L

. (Opftionai) ATTORNEY FOR (Name): Plaintiff, UNIFUND CCR, LLC SAN MATEO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO :

STREET ADDRESS. 400 COUNTY CENTER SECOND FLOOR JAN - 8 2013

MAILING ADDRESS

ciry ANDZIP CODE. Redwood City, CA 94063 BRANCHNAME. Civil Division PLAINTIFF: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California DEFENDANT: SUAIMA BARAJAS, an individual, and Does 1-100, inclusive

X] DOES 1 TO 100

FOR COURT USE ONLY CONTRACT

[X] COMPLAINT [ ] AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number): ] CROSS-COMPLAINT [ ] AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number, Jurisdiction (check all that apply):

[X] ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [X] does not exceed $10,000

[] exceeds $10,000 but does not exceed $25,000 \ [ ] ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000)2

[ ] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint [ ] from limited to unlimited from unlimited to limited

CASE NUMBER

1. Plaintiff* (name or names): UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California

alleges causes of action against defendant* (name or names): SUAIMA BARAJAS, an individual.

2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 4 3. a. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult [X] except plaintiff (name): UNIFUND CCR, LLC (1) [ ] acorporation qualified to do business in California (2) [X] an unincorporated entity (describe): UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California. (3) [ ] other (specify): b. [ ] Plaintiff (name): : a. [ ] has complied with the fictitious business name laws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

b. [ ] has complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify): c. [ ] Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3c.

4 a Each defendant named above is a natural person

[ ] except defendant (name): [ ] exceptdefendant (name): (1) [ ] abusiness organization, form unknown (1) [ ] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) [ ] acorporation (2) [ ] acorporation (3) [ ] anunincorporated entity (describe): (3) [ ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [ ] a public entity (describe): (4) [ ] apublic entity (describe) (5) [ ] other (specify): (5) [ ] Other (specify): Page 1 of 4

PLD-C-001

', [ SHORT TITLE: UNIFUND CCR. LLC v. SUAIMA BARAJAS

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [X] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): _1-50 were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [X] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): _51-100 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. [ ] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [ ] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. [ ] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [ ] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [ ] is excused from complying because (specify): 6 [ ] This action is subjectto [ ] Civil Code section 1812.10 [ ] Civil Code section 2984 .4,

7. This court is the proper court because

. [ ] adefendant entered into the contract here.

. [ 1 adefendant lived here when the contract was entered into.

. [X] a defendant lives here now. [ ] the contract was to be performed here. [ ] adefendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. [ ] real property that is the subject of this action is located here.

. { ] other (specify):

@ o0 ao0o

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of . attached):

[X] Breach of Contract [X] Common Counts [ 1 Other (specify):

9. [ ] Other allegations:

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. [X] damages of: $ 8,574.07 b. [X] interest on the damages (1) [ ] according to proof (2) [X] at the rate of (specify). 10.00 percent per year from (date): 06/09/2010 c. [X] attorney’'s fees

(1) [ Jof$ (2) [X] according to proof.

d. [ ] other (specify):

11. [ ] The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

2| ,'?./ Date: Matthew W. Quall, 183759 > Ow__/ Manuel E. Ignacio, 279191 Christopher A. Miguel 283127

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.) SORTTME NFUGCCR v SURMAGARAS | cAemwem -} SHORT TITLE: UNIFUND CCR, LLC v. SUAIMA BARAJAS CASE NUMBER:

SORTTME NFUGCCR v SURMAGARAS | cAemwem -} SHORT TITLE: UNIFUND CCR, LLC v. SUAIMA BARAJAS CASE NUMBER:

Second (number)

CAUSE OF ACTION - COMMON COUNTS

ATTACHMENT TO [X] Complaint [ ] Cross - Complaint (Use a separate cause of action form for each cause of action.)

CC-1. Plaintiff (name): UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California alleges that defendant (name). SUAIMA BARAJAS became indebted to [ ] plaintiff [X] other (name): Plaintiff's predecessor in interest, CITIBANK, NA

a. [X] within the last four years (1) [X] on an open book account for money due. (2) [ ]because an account was stated in writing by and between plaintiff and defendant in which it was agreed that defendant was indebted to plaintiff.

b. [X] within the last [ ] two years [X]four years (1) [ ]for money had and received by defendant for the use and benefit of plaintiff. (2) [ ]for work, labor, services and materials rendered at the special instance and request of defendant and for which defendant promises to pay plaintiff [ ] the sumof $ [ ] the reasonable value. (3) [ ]for goods, wares, and merchandise sold and delivered to defendant and for which defendant promised to pay plaintiff [ ]the sumof $ [ ] the reasonable value. (4) [X] for money lent by plaintiff to defendant at defendant's request. (5) [X] for money paid, laid out, and expended to or for defendant at defendant's special instance and request. (6) [ ]other (specify):

CC-2. $8574.07, which is the reasonable value, is due and unpaid despite plaintiffs demand, plus prejudgment interest [ ] according to proof [X] at the rate of 10.00 percent per year from (date). 06/09/2010

CC-3. [X] Plaintiff is entitled to attomey fees by an agreement or a statute [] of$ [X] according to proof.

CC4. [ ]Other:

PLD-C-001 [Rev. January 1. 2007 Complaint- Contract Page 4 of 4