This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:19:15 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR VS. PATRICIA E. CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 UNIFUND CCR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATRICIA E CASTILLO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4899

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

PATRICIA E. CASTILLO

CASTILLO, PATRICIA E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS AS TO PATRICIA E. CASTILLO, BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, EMPLOYEE. MAILING DATE OF 09/17/12.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 12/13/12 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

Declaration LOST WRIT FOR SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment LOST WRIT FOR SAN MATEO COUNTY

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT ACCOUNT BALANCE, INTEREST & ECT.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (2) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $258.00 ---

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 118 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 1181.42, cost 613.00, credit 1579.19.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Cos Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $743.00 Credit: $762.02 Interest: $1162.11

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment D1033: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS

Conversion Action.

WRIT (34) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (3) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $482.26, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $128.00 ---

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS AS TO PATRICIA E. CASTILLO.

Order.

Order RE: LOST WRIT FOR SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment RE: LOST WRIT FOR SAN MATEO COUNTY

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 104 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 1048.06, COSTS 588.00, CREDITS 1579.19.

Conversion Action.

WRIT (10) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP; Awarded Against: CASTILLO, PATRICIA E.; Amount; Damages: $3,483.30; Pre-Judgment Interest: $773.96; Costs: $405.00; Total: $4662.26; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/13/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, FOR UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST PATRICIA E. CASTILLO PRINCIPAL IS $3,483.30. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $773.96. COSTS ARE $405.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,662.26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment to the County of SAN FRANCISCO Issued On: 06/26/18 Amount: $5830.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Cos Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $743.00 Credit: $762.02 Interest: $1162.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Return. Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEO Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 10/26/16 Amount: 4 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 10/26/16 Amount: 4902.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment to the County of SAN MATEO Issued On: 10/26/2016 Amount: 4902.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: Order RE: LOST WRIT FOR SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment RE: LOST WRIT FOR SAN MATEO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 118 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 1181.42, cost 613.00, credit 1579.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Declaration LOST WRIT FOR SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment LOST WRIT FOR SAN MATEO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Writ Issued. Additional Info: Comment SAN MATEO COUNTY 4744.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 104 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 1048.06, COSTS 588.00, CREDITS 1579.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-043041-HOJ MIELE, KENNETH J $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-054248-HOJ PMGI $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-024206-HOJ PMGI LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270331 UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP; Total Financial Assessment $300.00; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less